Tompkins, Kirsty Ann (CPSO#: 69532)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 31 Jul 1995 to 25 Aug 1995
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Aug 1995 to 22 Sep 1995
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001