Toms, David Andrew (CPSO#: 30618)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010