Tong, Kai Ming (CPSO#: 23037)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2004