Tong, Martin Medine Thien (CPSO#: 107981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Matlis Medical
8200 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 2S2
Phone: (905) 881-3212
Fax: (905) 881-3184
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Center
4801 Keele St,
North York, ON, M3J3A4
North York ON  M3J 3A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-7523
Fax: (416) 398-7524
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Tong, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tong ( CPSO# 107981)

Business Address:
Matlis Medical
8200 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 2S2

Business Address:
4801 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3A4
Phone Number: (416) 398-7523

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Martin  Medine  Thien  Tong  may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.