Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tong, Nhan Thien (CPSO#: 60880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Professional Health Care Corp
Suite 59
4801 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3A4
Phone: (416) 398-7523
Fax: (416) 398-7524
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 22, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nhan Thien Tong in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Tong has provided to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                          DR. NHAN THIEN TONG
                                             ("Dr. Tong")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Tong, certificate of registration number 60880, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File # 7214832 (the "Investigation") into whether I am
                  incompetent in my practice.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a period of six (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              two weeks for a period of three (3) months, and on approval
                              by the Clinical Supervisor, once a month for a further period
                              of three (3) months;
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) and shall include charts where I have
                        written prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                        Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all
                        other Monitored Drugs (the "Prescribing Log") and charts with
                        abnormal urine drug screens.  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Tong, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Tong, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that I have completed the University of
                        Toronto Safe Opioid Prescribing course. I undertake to provide
                        proof to the College of my successful completion of this course
                        within three (3) months of executing this Undertaking.

            (8)   Prescribing Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tong, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs (the "Prescribing Log") in the form set out at Appendix "B",
                        which will include at least the following information:  
                  
                        (i)   the date of the prescription;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                        (iv)  the medication dosage;
                        (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                        (vi)  the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and 
                        (vii) physician initials.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tong, shall keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for all
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Tong, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Tong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Tong, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Tong, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Tong was the subject of a College investigation into whether he
                        is incompetent in his practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Tong will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                              *     Dr. Tong's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 3 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Tong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Tong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Tong, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (4) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nhan Thien Tong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 22, 2016:

Dr. Tong was the subject of a College investigation into whether he is incompetent in his practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Tong will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Tong’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.