Tonkin, Katia Sonia (CPSO#: 53321)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011