Tonogai, Wayne Tadashi (CPSO#: 59436)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2007