Toong, Ying Lai Hannah (CPSO#: 52239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin, Swatow

Education:Shantung Medical College, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1E2
Phone: (416) 977-2833
Fax: (416) 813-4179
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YING LAI HANNAH TOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985