Torbiak, Raymond Paul (CPSO#: 56930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd. East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 4126
Fax: (905) 336-4148
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Torbiak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Torbiak ( CPSO# 56930 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND PAUL TORBIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORBIAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1990