Torgerson, Cory Stephen (CPSO#: 77996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 31
70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Phone: (647) 343-0207
Fax: (647) 343-0277
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Torgerson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2017


Corporation Name: Torgerson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Torgerson ( CPSO# 77996 )

Business Address:
Suite 31
70 Yorkville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Phone Number: (647) 343-0207

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORY STEPHEN TORGERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORGERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)