Torigian, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 84841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 988-9277
Fax: (905) 688-2652
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Torigian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Torigian ( CPSO# 84841 )

Business Address:
216 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-9277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW TORIGIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORIGIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008