Torkian-Valashani, Bahman (CPSO#: 84813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harmony Medical Clinic
1385 Harmony Road North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K5
Phone: (905) 436-9646
Fax: (905) 436-9666
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Torkian-Valashani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Torkian-Valashani ( CPSO# 84813 )

Business Address:
Harmony Medical Clinic
1385 Harmony Road North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K5
Phone Number: (905) 436-9646

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAHMAN TORKIAN-VALASHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORKIAN-VALASHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)