Torng, Shirley (CPSO#: 69978)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 8362 - 13th Avenue Burnaby, BC V3N 2G7
Date Received: 30 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014