Torontour, Samuel (CPSO#: 105171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
Walk In Clinic
1st Floor
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Torontour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Torontour ( CPSO# 105171)

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Health Service
Walk-In Clinic
First Floor
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N7
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Medical Records Location

Address: Kitchissippi Medical Clinic, 6th Floor, 1081 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4G2
Instructions: Fees may apply
Date Received: 12 Sep 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL TORONTOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORONTOUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2015