Torraville, Douglas Alfred (CPSO#: 61677)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1990