Torres, Felipe Soares (CPSO#: 88460)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Apr 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012