Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tors, Adrienne (CPSO#: 60814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#206
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 495-7972
Fax: (416) 495-1418
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE TORS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990