Torun, Nurhan (CPSO#: 67599)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Names: Torun-Priesol, Nurhan (used until: 27 Aug 2002 )     Torun, Nurhan (used until: 21 Nov 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hacettepe University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2013