Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Toscano, Marie (CPSO#: 66351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Greber Bureau 110
Gatineau QC  J8T 7W3
Phone: (819) 561-5553
Fax: (819) 561-5554

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE TOSCANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOSCANO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993