Toth, Adam Andrew (CPSO#: 63751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 695-2772
Fax: (416) 695-2199
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Toth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toth ( CPSO# 63751 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 695-2772

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM ANDREW TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992