Toth, Cory Calvin (CPSO#: 75925)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2001 to 04 May 2001
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Oct 2001 to 21 Dec 2001
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2001