Toth, Darryl Paul (CPSO#: 62152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 971-7546
Fax: (519) 971-9571
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRYL PAUL TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1991