Toth, Jason Alfred (CPSO#: 98369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Grp Headquarters
3500 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2H 8E9
Phone: 613-992-4581
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CF H Svcs C (O) Montfort Clinic
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K2B 5A4
Canada
Phone: 613-945-1111
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: (613) 732-9986
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ALFRED TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014