Toth, Julius Lloyd Roy (CPSO#: 55244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
56 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 853-5864
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Toth, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toth ( CPSO# 55244 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
206 - 9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 303-8490

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
56 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 853-5864

Business Address:
190 Cundles Road East
R.R. #3
Suite 205
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIUS LLOYD ROY TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 May 1985 to 16 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986