Toth, Peter (CPSO#: 65163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2W1
Phone: 905 813 1100 Ext. 5698
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway W, Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993