Totsoni Flynn, Janet (CPSO#: 59673)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 09 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Flynn, Janet (used until: 16 Aug 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: American Sign Language, English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1990
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 09 Apr 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Apr 2002
Summary:

 On April 8, 2002, the Discipline Committee, having found Dr. Janet Totsoni-Flynn guilty of 
 professional misconduct, ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Totsoni-Flynn attend before it to be 
 reprimanded on or before June 30, 2002 and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the 
 register;

2.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Totsoni-Flynn(s certificate of registration, the said 
 revocation is deemed to take place immediately; and,

3.	Dr. Totsoni-Flynn post security to 
 reimburse the College for funding under the program required under section 85.7 of the Health 
 Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 08, 2002