Tougas, Gervais (CPSO#: 51873)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Division of Gastroenterology St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 22 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015