Tougas, Manon (CPSO#: 67699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200, 4th Ave, St Catharines
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378 4647 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gha surgical center
726 Upper James st hamilton
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tougas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tougas ( CPSO# 67699 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jan 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANON TOUGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUGAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1994