Toukan, Ala Uddin (CPSO#: 46593)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2012