Toulany, Alene Ahlam (CPSO#: 84479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-5392
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toulany ( CPSO# 84479 )
Dr. J. Pugh ( CPSO# 91733 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALENE AHLAM TOULANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOULANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010