Tountas, Apostolos A (CPSO#: 32723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1017 Wilson Avenue
Suite 404
Downsview ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 398-9624
Fax: (416) 398-9626
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. A. Tountas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tountas ( CPSO# 32723 )

Business Address:
404 - 1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 398-9624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APOSTOLOS A TOUNTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUNTAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1981