Toupin, Melissa (CPSO#: 86692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Rd.
Division of Hematology - CPCR bldg
Room L2281; box 201a
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71917
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Toupin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Toupin ( CPSO# 86692 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Divison of Hematology - CPCR Building
Room L2281. box 201A
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA TOUPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUPIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011