Tousignant, Claude Pierre Joseph (CPSO#: 58345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claude P. Tousignant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tousignant ( CPSO# 58345 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDE PIERRE JOSEPH TOUSIGNANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUSIGNANT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1994