Touzel, Elizabeth Lyn (CPSO#: 55660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310 Bridge Street West
Unit A Suite C01
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-2858
Fax: (613) 354-6495
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Touzel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Touzel ( CPSO# 55660 )
Dr. T. Touzel ( CPSO# 55682 )

Business Address:
310 Bridge Street West
Unit A, Suite C01
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-2858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH LYN TOUZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUZEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988