Touzel, Thomas Alexander (CPSO#: 55682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-2858
Fax: (613) 354-6495
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Touzel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Touzel ( CPSO# 55660 )
Dr. T. Touzel ( CPSO# 55682 )

Business Address:
310 Bridge Street West
Unit A, Suite C01
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-2858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ALEXANDER TOUZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUZEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988