Tovar-Spinoza, Zulma Sarah (CPSO#: 83928)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Los Andes, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 14 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008