Tower, Nicholas John (CPSO#: 27821)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002