Towers, Mark Joseph Nicholas (CPSO#: 61648)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2017