Townsend, Constance Mary (CPSO#: 19734)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Dept. of Family and Community Medicine 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Feb 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013