Townshend, Lois Ethel Myers (CPSO#: 55571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: Myers Townshend, Lois Ethel (used until: 21 Jul 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Associated Eye Surgeons
45 Resnik Road
Plymouth MA  02360
United States
Phone: (508) 747-4748
Fax: (508) 747-0124
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Associated Eye Surgeons
441 Route 130
Sandwich MA  02563
United States
Phone: (508) 888-8873
Fax: (508) 747-0124
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOIS ETHEL MYERS TOWNSHEND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOWNSHEND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1986