Townsley, Carol Anne (CPSO#: 73495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
ACTT Clinic 6 East
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 3297
Fax: (416) 323-6001
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Moozar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Townsley ( CPSO# 73495 )
Dr. K. Moozar ( CPSO# 73855 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
2nd Floor, West Wing
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE TOWNSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOWNSLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001