Toye, Baldwin Wing (CPSO#: 52292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8323
Fax: (613) 737-8557
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BALDWIN WING TOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1988