Toye, John William (CPSO#: 52508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John W. Toye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toye ( CPSO# 52508 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM TOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOYE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983