Toze, Cynthia Lorraine (CPSO#: 58897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 13 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1995