Tozman, Seymour (CPSO#: 21786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Colonnade
Suite 609
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1S3
Phone: (416) 921-0315
Fax: (416) 921-9437
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYMOUR TOZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOZMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1983