Trachtenberg, John (CPSO#: 29597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Trachtenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Trachtenberg ( CPSO# 29597 )

Business Address:
The Prostate Centre
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
620 University Avenue
Suite 3-208
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TRACHTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRACHTENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1982