Trainor, Shannon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Floor C2 Suite 160C
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4808
Fax: (905) 433-4577
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH TRAINOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAINOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2004