Trainor, William Brian (CPSO#: 31861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Surrey Street West
Suite 103
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 837-1170
Fax: (519) 837-1240
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Trainor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Trainor ( CPSO# 31861 )

Business Address:
103 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 837-1170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM BRIAN TRAINOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAINOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1980