Tram, Bich Van Jenny (CPSO#: 79180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 287-2035
Fax: (905) 287-2036
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bich Van Tram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tram ( CPSO# 79180 )

Business Address:
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 102
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 287-2035

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BICH VAN JENNY TRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005