Tram, Khai Minh (CPSO#: 71508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
302 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2E7
Phone: (416) 203-6866
Fax: (416) 203-9580
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Minh Tram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tram ( CPSO# 71508 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
302 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 203-6866

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHAI MINH TRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001